05/10/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |||
05/07/2012 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |||
05/03/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |||
05/02/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/01/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/28/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |