LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2102
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2102
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2102
Action History
05/25/2012
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
04/25/2012
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
04/18/2012
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
04/09/2012
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
03/29/2012
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
02/24/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
02/23/2012
Read first time. To print.