California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2104 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill July 6, 2012
Bill June 21, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 25, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012