California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2111 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill July 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 24, 2012

Amended

Bill May 3, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012
Bill March 12, 2012