|
07/09/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 56, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3959.).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4890.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|