|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 248, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 4570.).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 4764.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4702.)
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|