05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/02/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/12/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. | |||
04/11/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/10/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 9). | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |