|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 696, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5892.).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4443.).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4977.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|