05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/10/2012 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 4783.) From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/07/2012 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
05/03/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |||
05/01/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
04/30/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/24/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |