LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB214
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB214
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB214
Compare Versions
AB214 Chaptered September 21, 2011
AB214 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB214 Amended August 15, 2011
AB214 Amended June 30, 2011
AB214 Introduced January 31, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB214 Chaptered September 21, 2011
AB214 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB214 Amended August 15, 2011
AB214 Amended June 30, 2011
AB214 Introduced January 31, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare