California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2146 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill July 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 24, 2012

Amended

Bill May 7, 2012
Bill April 30, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012