California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2152 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 21, 2012
Bill June 21, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012