|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 250, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4645.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 5056.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|