LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2163
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2163
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2163
Action History
04/26/2012
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
04/23/2012
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4477.)
04/16/2012
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
03/19/2012
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
02/24/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
02/23/2012
Read first time. To print.