|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 603, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 19. Page 6561.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 4904.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 11).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 18. Page 4780.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 16).
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|