|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:05 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5948.).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4478.).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4777.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and W., P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|