|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 252, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:05 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 20. Page 5956.).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4473.).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 4880.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|