LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2175
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2175
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2175
Action History
04/23/2012
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
04/09/2012
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
03/08/2012
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
02/24/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
02/23/2012
Read first time. To print.