California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2179 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill August 8, 2012
Bill July 3, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 26, 2012
Bill April 18, 2012