02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Held under submission. | |||
05/17/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/03/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/02/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/07/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/02/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. | |||
02/01/2011 | Read first time. To print. |