|
09/14/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 322, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 6210.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 22).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 4438.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4930.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4818.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|