BILL NUMBER: AB 2180CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 322 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 14, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 14, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 9, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 23, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 20, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 14, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Alejo FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to add Section 32121.6 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to local health care districts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2180, Alejo. Local health care districts: employment contracts. The Local Health Care District Law authorizes the organization and management of local hospital districts. That law authorizes the board of supervisors of a local hospital district to establish, maintain, and operate, or provide assistance in the operation of, one or more health facilities or health services, including, but not limited to, retirement programs, services, and facilities. Existing law authorizes a local health care district to enter into a written employment contract with a hospital administrator. This bill would require a hospital administrator employment agreement to include specified employment information. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 32121.6 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 32121.6. If a health care district enters into a written employment agreement with a hospital administrator, including a hospital administrator who is designated as a chief executive officer, the written employment agreement shall include all material terms and conditions agreed to between the district and the hospital administrator regarding compensation, deferred compensation, retirement benefits, severance or continuing compensation after termination of the agreement, vacation pay and other paid time off for illness or personal reasons, and other employment benefits that differ from those available to other full-time employees.