05/31/2012 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
05/21/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/21/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 25. Page 4929.) | |||
05/03/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/02/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 2). | |||
04/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/11/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/10/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/27/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |