08/06/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/28/2012 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
06/15/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
05/31/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/03/2012 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
04/26/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/26/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4556.) | |||
04/16/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/12/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11). | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |