California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2184 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 9, 2012
Bill June 20, 2012