|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6372.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4749.).
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4318.).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4785.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|