|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 862, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6633.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (August 30). Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 6700.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 7. Page 4945.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 28). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4813.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|