02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/11/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/10/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/13/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/07/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/06/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/05/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/22/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/15/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/02/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. | |||
02/01/2011 | Read first time. To print. |