|
09/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 481, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 4741.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 3. Page 4694.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Calderon. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4694.)
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 4825.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|