|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 541, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2449.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2392.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1643.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|