|
06/18/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5144.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|