07/03/2012 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/24/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | |||
04/17/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/16/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/29/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |