California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2214 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill July 3, 2012
Bill June 20, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill March 27, 2012