08/30/2012 | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton. | |||
08/07/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/06/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (July 3). | |||
05/24/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/14/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/14/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 4. Page 4817.) | |||
05/07/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/03/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |||
04/26/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/12/2012 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |