LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2221
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2221
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2221
Compare Versions
AB2221 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB2221 Enrolled August 20, 2012
AB2221 Amended August 6, 2012
AB2221 Amended March 28, 2012
AB2221 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2221 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB2221 Enrolled August 20, 2012
AB2221 Amended August 6, 2012
AB2221 Amended March 28, 2012
AB2221 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare