LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2224
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2224
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2224
Action History
04/26/2012
From committee: That the measure be retained in committee, and that the subject matter be referred to the Committee on Rules for assignment to the proper committee for study. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 26).
03/29/2012
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
02/27/2012
Read first time.
02/26/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
02/24/2012
Introduced. To print.