06/19/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |||
05/03/2012 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and N.R. & W. | |||
04/26/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/26/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 11. Page 4558.) | |||
04/19/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 17). | |||
03/26/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
03/22/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/12/2012 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |