08/25/2011 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
08/15/2011 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/30/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/10/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/08/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
06/01/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/01/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1728.) | |||
05/31/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/04/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/11/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/07/2011 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/06/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (March 30). | |||
02/03/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | |||
02/02/2011 | Read first time. To print. |