California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2243 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2012

Amended

Bill August 7, 2012
Bill May 7, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012