California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2250 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 05/03/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2250AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 3, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 9, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 21, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Beth Gaines and Norby (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Bonilla, Donnelly,  Gorell,  Knight, and Portantino) (  Coauthor:   Senator   Runner   Coauthors:   Senators   Cannella   and Runner  ) FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add Section 68074.5 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2250, as amended, Beth Gaines. Public postsecondary education: nonresident tuition: military members. Existing law establishes the segments of the public postsecondary education system in the state, including the University of California administered by the Regents of the University of California, the California State University administered by the Trustees of the California State University, and the California Community Colleges administered by the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges. Existing law establishes uniform student residency requirements for purposes of ascertaining the amount of fees to be paid by students at these segments of public postsecondary education. This bill would require a student, or a spouse of a person, who is a former member of the Armed Forces of the United States or the State Military Reserve who served for at least 36 months and received a specified discharge, to be exempt from paying nonresident tuition  for his or her first year of continuous enrollment  at the California State University and the California Community Colleges if he or she files an affidavit with the institution stating his or her intent to establish residency in California as soon as possible, and would request  those persons to   that such a person  be exempt from paying nonresident tuition    for his or her first year of continuous enrollment  at the University of California. By requiring community college districts to exempt these persons from paying nonresident tuition, this bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 68074.5 is added to the Education Code, to read: 68074.5. (a) A student, or spouse of a person, who is a former member of the Armed Forces of the United States or the State Military Reserve who served for at least 36 months and received an honorable discharge, shall be exempt from paying nonresident tuition    for his or her first year of continuous enrollment  at the California State University and the California Community Colleges, and is requested to be exempt from paying nonresident tuition    for   his or her first year of continuous enrollment  at the University of California, if he or she files an affidavit with the institution stating that he or she intends to establish residency in California as soon as possible. (b) For purposes of this section, "Armed Forces of the United States" means the Air Force, Army, Coast Guard, Marine Corps, National Guard, Naval Militia, Navy, and the reserve components of each of those forces, including the California National Guard. SEC. 2. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.