California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2252 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 23, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012