|
08/30/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Kehoe.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1355.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|