07/03/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |||
05/17/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/07/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/07/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4707.) | |||
05/02/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/01/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30). | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |