06/12/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |||
04/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/23/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/23/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4485.) | |||
04/19/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/18/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 10). | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |