|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 30. Page 5172.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|