06/25/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
06/04/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/31/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 31. Page 5196.) | |||
05/14/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/10/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 9). | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |