|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5141.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|