|
08/25/2011
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 1041.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (March 30).
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|