California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB227 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/02/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 227INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hall FEBRUARY 2, 2011 An act to amend Section 51871.5 of the Education Code, relating to education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 227, as introduced, Hall. Education technology planning. Existing law requires that, as a precondition to receiving a technology grant administered by the State Department of Education, a school district shall have a current 3- to 5-year education technology plan, unless this requirement is waived by the State Board of Education. Existing law also requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to develop guidelines and criteria for inclusion in the education technology plan, including a component to educate pupils and teachers on specified topics. This bill would expand that list of topics to include the prevention of, and legal consequences for, cyberbullying, the active use of parental content control software, and the responsible use by pupils of mobile communication technology. The bill would exempt from compliance with this requirement a school district that, on July 1, 2011, has a 3- to 5-year education technology plan until that plan expires or is voluntarily replaced, at which time the school district would be subject to the requirement. The bill would make other conforming changes. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 51871.5 of the Education Code is amended to read: 51871.5. (a) It is the intent of the Legislature that education technology planning be accomplished in the most comprehensive manner possible. To that end, the current practice of developing education technology plans for each funding program  should be   was  replaced with a comprehensive local planning process that  will enable   enables  school districts to apply for grants on an ongoing basis and  assist   assists them  in utilizing available education technology programs. (b)  On or after January 1, 2005, as   As  a precondition to receiving a technology grant administered by the department, a school district shall have a current three- to five-year education technology plan. The state board may waive this requirement if it determines that the applicant school district made a good faith effort to develop a plan, but for reasons beyond its control, the district cannot develop the plan before receipt of the technology grant. (c)  (1)     On or before July 1, 2007, the   The    Superintendent shall develop guidelines and criteria for inclusion in the education technology plan required pursuant to subdivision (b). The guidelines and criteria shall include  , but are not limited to,  a component to educate pupils and teachers on  the   all of the following:   (A)     The  appropriate and ethical use of information technology in the  classroom, Internet   classroom.   (B)     Internet   safety, the   safety.   (C)     The  manner in which to avoid committing  plagiarism, the   plagiarism.   (D)     The  concept, purpose, and significance of a copyright so that pupils are equipped with the skills necessary to distinguish lawful from unlawful online  downloading, and the   downloading.   (E)     The  implications of illegal peer-to-peer network file sharing.  (F) The prevention of cyberbullying and legal consequences for pupils engaging in cyberbullying.   (G) The active use of parental content control software.   (H) Responsible use by pupils of mobile communication technology.   (2) School districts are encouraged to partner with the California Technology Assistance Project, information technology companies, and nonprofit organizations to develop tools to supplement the existing Internet safety curriculum that address the educational component of the guidelines and criteria developed pursuant to this subdivision.   A   (3)     A  school district that, on July 1,  2008   2011  , has a current three- to five-year education technology plan that complies with subdivision (b) is not required to comply with this subdivision until after its plan expires or is voluntarily replaced. (d)  On or after January 1, 2005, the   The  Superintendent shall ensure that each school district has access to technical assistance and an approved online technology plan builder that the department determines is in compliance with state and federal requirements. (e) The department shall maintain a record of school districts that have a three- to five-year education technology plan and shall make that information available to interested public agencies.