|
08/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 200, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4446.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4676.)
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|